LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1169
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1169
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1169
Compare Versions
SB1169 Chaptered September 9, 2016
SB1169 Enrolled August 19, 2016
SB1169 Amended June 30, 2016
SB1169 Amended May 31, 2016
SB1169 Amended April 7, 2016
SB1169 Introduced February 18, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SB1169 Chaptered September 9, 2016
SB1169 Enrolled August 19, 2016
SB1169 Amended June 30, 2016
SB1169 Amended May 31, 2016
SB1169 Amended April 7, 2016
SB1169 Introduced February 18, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare