|
09/09/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 281, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5341.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 3. Page 5906.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/10/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (August 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2016
|
Referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2016
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 5. Page 4640.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4553.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|