California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1187 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 9, 2016

Amended

Bill August 11, 2016
Bill August 3, 2016
Bill June 22, 2016