|
09/28/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 787, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 5373.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6077.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5955.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/10/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (August 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
August 3 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2016
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 4121.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4005.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2016
|
Set for hearing May 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2016
|
May 23 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2016
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 3646.) (April 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2016
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2016
|
April 13 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2016
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2016
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|