California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1189 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill August 3, 2016
Bill June 22, 2016
Bill April 26, 2016
Bill April 13, 2016
Bill March 28, 2016