|
04/25/2016
|
Last day to consider Governors veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2015
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2015
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 3. Page 2660.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 3. Page 2962.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/14/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/07/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2015
|
June 29 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 1250.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1147.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
May 26 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
May 18 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 817.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 591.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 506.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2015
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D., G.O., and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|