LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB119
Draft Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB119
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB119
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
January 14, 2015
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
September 10, 2015
Compare
Amended
Bill
September 4, 2015
Compare
Bill
August 31, 2015
Compare
Bill
August 17, 2015
Compare
Bill
July 1, 2015
Compare
Bill
June 16, 2015
Compare
Bill
June 1, 2015
Compare
Bill
May 12, 2015
Compare
Bill
May 5, 2015
Compare
Bill
April 20, 2015
Compare
Bill
April 6, 2015
Compare