California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1212 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2016

Amended

Bill August 15, 2016
Bill June 20, 2016
Bill May 3, 2016
Bill April 26, 2016
Bill April 12, 2016
Bill March 28, 2016