LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1212
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1212
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1212
Compare Versions
SB1212 Chaptered September 29, 2016
SB1212 Enrolled August 29, 2016
SB1212 Amended August 15, 2016
SB1212 Amended June 20, 2016
SB1212 Amended May 3, 2016
SB1212 Amended April 26, 2016
SB1212 Amended April 12, 2016
SB1212 Amended March 28, 2016
SB1212 Introduced February 18, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SB1212 Chaptered September 29, 2016
SB1212 Enrolled August 29, 2016
SB1212 Amended August 15, 2016
SB1212 Amended June 20, 2016
SB1212 Amended May 3, 2016
SB1212 Amended April 26, 2016
SB1212 Amended April 12, 2016
SB1212 Amended March 28, 2016
SB1212 Introduced February 18, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare