|
09/22/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 476, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 14. Page 5372.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 18. Page 6098.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
August 27 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2015
|
July 15 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 15. Page 1289.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1147.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
May 4 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2015
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 648.) (April 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2015
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|