California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB122 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 15, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 22, 2016

Amended

Bill August 15, 2016
Bill June 1, 2015
Bill April 20, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015
Bill March 12, 2015