|
08/29/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 238, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4881.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/10/2016
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5707.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2016
|
June 8 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3629.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3520.) (April 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2016
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2016
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2016
|
April 6 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2016
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|