California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1229 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 12, 2016

Chaptered

Bill August 29, 2016

Amended

Bill June 27, 2016
Bill June 14, 2016
Bill April 19, 2016
Bill March 28, 2016