California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB123 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 15, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2016

Amended

Bill August 18, 2016
Bill August 15, 2016
Bill August 1, 2016
Bill June 30, 2016
Bill June 16, 2016
Bill May 16, 2016
Bill May 12, 2015
Bill April 6, 2015