LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB123
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB123
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB123
Compare Versions
SB123 Enrolled September 2, 2016
SB123 Amended August 18, 2016
SB123 Amended August 15, 2016
SB123 Amended August 1, 2016
SB123 Amended June 30, 2016
SB123 Amended June 16, 2016
SB123 Amended May 16, 2016
SB123 Amended May 12, 2015
SB123 Amended April 6, 2015
SB123 Introduced January 15, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB123 Enrolled September 2, 2016
SB123 Amended August 18, 2016
SB123 Amended August 15, 2016
SB123 Amended August 1, 2016
SB123 Amended June 30, 2016
SB123 Amended June 16, 2016
SB123 Amended May 16, 2016
SB123 Amended May 12, 2015
SB123 Amended April 6, 2015
SB123 Introduced January 15, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare