|
09/12/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 308, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5141.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5779.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4150.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4006.) (May 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2016
|
Set for hearing May 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
May 2 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2016
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3520.) (April 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2016
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3311.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2016
|
Set for hearing March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|