California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1232 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 19, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 12, 2016

Amended

Bill June 30, 2016
Bill May 31, 2016
Bill April 19, 2016
Bill March 28, 2016