California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1234 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill September 7, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2016

Amended

Bill August 18, 2016
Bill August 15, 2016
Bill June 15, 2016
Bill May 31, 2016
Bill April 5, 2016