LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1234
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1234
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1234
Compare Versions
SB1234 Chaptered September 29, 2016
SB1234 Enrolled September 7, 2016
SB1234 Amended August 18, 2016
SB1234 Amended August 15, 2016
SB1234 Amended June 15, 2016
SB1234 Amended May 31, 2016
SB1234 Amended April 5, 2016
SB1234 Introduced February 18, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SB1234 Chaptered September 29, 2016
SB1234 Enrolled September 7, 2016
SB1234 Amended August 18, 2016
SB1234 Amended August 15, 2016
SB1234 Amended June 15, 2016
SB1234 Amended May 31, 2016
SB1234 Amended April 5, 2016
SB1234 Introduced February 18, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare