|
09/25/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 632, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 13. Page 5597.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 21. Page 6576.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (August 25). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5948.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 6.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 3847.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2016
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3700.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2016
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2016
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|