LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1241
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1241
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1241
Compare Versions
SB1241 Chaptered September 25, 2016
SB1241 Enrolled September 7, 2016
SB1241 Amended August 29, 2016
SB1241 Amended August 19, 2016
SB1241 Amended June 20, 2016
SB1241 Amended June 14, 2016
SB1241 Amended April 18, 2016
SB1241 Amended March 29, 2016
SB1241 Introduced February 18, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SB1241 Chaptered September 25, 2016
SB1241 Enrolled September 7, 2016
SB1241 Amended August 29, 2016
SB1241 Amended August 19, 2016
SB1241 Amended June 20, 2016
SB1241 Amended June 14, 2016
SB1241 Amended April 18, 2016
SB1241 Amended March 29, 2016
SB1241 Introduced February 18, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare