|
11/30/2016
|
Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2016
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2016
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 4984.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 42. Noes 31. Page 5722.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2016
|
June 8 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2016
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 9. Page 3801.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3700.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2016
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|