California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1257 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 16, 2016

Amended

Bill June 30, 2016
Bill June 23, 2016
Bill May 31, 2016
Bill May 3, 2016