|
09/29/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 843, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 5476.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 43. Noes 30. Page 6307.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2016
|
Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 50. Noes 21. Page 5980.) Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 39. Noes 30. Page 5928.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Eduardo Garcia.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 6.) (August 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 13. Page 3806.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2016
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 3419.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2016
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2016
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|