LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1263
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1263
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1263
Compare Versions
SB1263 Chaptered September 29, 2016
SB1263 Enrolled September 2, 2016
SB1263 Amended August 19, 2016
SB1263 Amended August 11, 2016
SB1263 Amended June 29, 2016
SB1263 Amended June 20, 2016
SB1263 Amended June 8, 2016
SB1263 Introduced February 18, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SB1263 Chaptered September 29, 2016
SB1263 Enrolled September 2, 2016
SB1263 Amended August 19, 2016
SB1263 Amended August 11, 2016
SB1263 Amended June 29, 2016
SB1263 Amended June 20, 2016
SB1263 Amended June 8, 2016
SB1263 Introduced February 18, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare