|
09/28/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 790, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 6 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5431.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2016
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5926.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/10/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (August 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/02/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2016
|
June 22 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3737.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2016
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2016
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3494.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2016
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|