California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1285 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2016

Amended

Bill August 2, 2016
Bill April 6, 2016