|
11/30/2016
|
Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2016
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2016
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 5363.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 48. Noes 26. Page 5925.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 6.) (August 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 3924.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2016
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
May 2 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2016
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 3608.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2016
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2016
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|