California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1288 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2016

Amended

Bill August 1, 2016
Bill June 29, 2016
Bill June 15, 2016
Bill April 4, 2016