California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1300 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill August 15, 2016
Bill June 30, 2016
Bill May 31, 2016
Bill April 26, 2016
Bill April 5, 2016