LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1300
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1300
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1300
Compare Versions
SB1300 Enrolled August 29, 2016
SB1300 Amended August 19, 2016
SB1300 Amended August 15, 2016
SB1300 Amended June 30, 2016
SB1300 Amended May 31, 2016
SB1300 Amended April 26, 2016
SB1300 Amended April 5, 2016
SB1300 Introduced February 19, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SB1300 Enrolled August 29, 2016
SB1300 Amended August 19, 2016
SB1300 Amended August 15, 2016
SB1300 Amended June 30, 2016
SB1300 Amended May 31, 2016
SB1300 Amended April 26, 2016
SB1300 Amended April 5, 2016
SB1300 Introduced February 19, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare