|
11/30/2016
|
Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2016
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2016
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5527.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2016
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6364.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2016
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3977.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2016
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2016
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3836.) (May 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
Re-referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2016
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|