California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1304 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2016

Amended

Bill August 15, 2016
Bill June 23, 2016
Bill June 8, 2016
Bill April 21, 2016