California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1305 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 12, 2016

Chaptered

Bill August 26, 2016

Amended

Bill May 16, 2016
Bill May 10, 2016
Bill March 30, 2016