LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1305
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1305
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1305
Compare Versions
SB1305 Chaptered August 26, 2016
SB1305 Enrolled August 12, 2016
SB1305 Amended May 16, 2016
SB1305 Amended May 10, 2016
SB1305 Amended March 30, 2016
SB1305 Introduced February 19, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SB1305 Chaptered August 26, 2016
SB1305 Enrolled August 12, 2016
SB1305 Amended May 16, 2016
SB1305 Amended May 10, 2016
SB1305 Amended March 30, 2016
SB1305 Introduced February 19, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare