California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1311 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 12, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2016

Amended

Bill May 17, 2016
Bill April 26, 2016
Bill April 5, 2016