LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1311
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1311
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1311
Compare Versions
SB1311 Chaptered September 30, 2016
SB1311 Enrolled August 12, 2016
SB1311 Amended May 17, 2016
SB1311 Amended April 26, 2016
SB1311 Amended April 5, 2016
SB1311 Introduced February 19, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SB1311 Chaptered September 30, 2016
SB1311 Enrolled August 12, 2016
SB1311 Amended May 17, 2016
SB1311 Amended April 26, 2016
SB1311 Amended April 5, 2016
SB1311 Introduced February 19, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare