|
11/30/2016
|
Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
|
|
|
|
09/24/2016
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/24/2016
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 5514.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 2. Page 6087.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2016
|
Referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 8. Page 4064.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 4008.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2016
|
Set for hearing May 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2016
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2016
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|