California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1328 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2016

Amended

Bill August 18, 2016
Bill June 21, 2016
Bill April 25, 2016
Bill March 28, 2016