|
09/24/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 595, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/24/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 6 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5409.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6079.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Waldron. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2016
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3956.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2016
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2016
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3592.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2016
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2016
|
April 11 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2016
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2016
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|