California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1331 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 24, 2016

Amended

Bill August 18, 2016
Bill June 29, 2016
Bill June 20, 2016
Bill April 11, 2016