|
09/30/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 890, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5559.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6475.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 49. Noes 20. Page 5987.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/10/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (August 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. (Corrected July 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 4063.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2016
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3767.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2016
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2016
|
April 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2016
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3519.) (April 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2016
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2016
|
Re-referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2016
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|