California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1336 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill September 6, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2016

Amended

Bill August 25, 2016
Bill August 19, 2016
Bill August 4, 2016
Bill June 30, 2016
Bill April 14, 2016
Bill March 28, 2016