|
11/30/2016
|
Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
|
|
|
|
09/24/2016
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/24/2016
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 14. Page 5364.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 47. Noes 31. Page 5913.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/10/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 5.) (August 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
August 3 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 9. Noes 5.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2016
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 5473.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2016
|
June 14 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 6. Noes 8.) Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on W., P., & W. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 12. Page 3873.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 3496.) (April 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2016
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2016
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|