California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1340 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2016

Amended

Bill June 21, 2016
Bill June 8, 2016
Bill April 5, 2016