08/19/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 154, Statutes of 2016. | |||
08/19/2016 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Senate | 08/10/2016 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. | ||
Senate | 08/04/2016 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 08/04/2016 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5707.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/27/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 06/23/2016 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 22). | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2016 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2016 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2016 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3872.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2016 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2016 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3608.) (April 20). | ||
Senate | 04/12/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2016 | Set for hearing April 20. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2016 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |