California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1343 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 5, 2016

Chaptered

Bill August 19, 2016

Amended

Bill May 4, 2016
Bill April 12, 2016