|
08/26/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 217, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 6. Page 5028.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5780.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 7. Page 3925.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2016
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 3617.) (April 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2016
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2016
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|