California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1345 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 17, 2016

Chaptered

Bill August 26, 2016

Amended

Bill June 20, 2016
Bill April 25, 2016
Bill March 28, 2016