|
09/23/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 501, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 5490.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6230.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2016
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2016
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 4147.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2016
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2016
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3646.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2016
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|